Семён Иванович Тевяшов - Цело породично стабло
Из пројекта Родовид
Особа:894979
Generation of a large tree takes a lot of resources of our web server. Anonymous users can only see 7 generations of ancestors and 7 - of descendants on the full tree to decrease server loading by search engines. If you wish to see a full tree without registration, add text ?showfulltree=yes directly to the end of URL of this page. Please, don't use direct link to a full tree anywhere else.
This tree contains: 5 families with 32 people in 7 lineages, 25 of these people are blood relatives; 0 families with 0 people are hidden.
1
1
2
♂ Маматы-Ходжа Мисаил Татарин
Рођење: Татарское царство
Хришчанство крштење: 1393, Русское великое княжество, Татарское царство
Хришчанство крштење: 1393, Русское великое княжество, Татарское царство
2
3
3
4
4
5
5
Прародитељи
Прародитељи
Родитељи
Родитељи
== 8 ==
== 8 ==
Деца
Деца
Унучад
Унучад
11
11
12
12
13
13
14
14
15
♂ Дмитрий Васильевич Чертков
Рођење: 1 мај 1758, Российская империя, 12.05.1758 по н.с.
Свадба: ♀ Евдокия (Авдотья) Степановна Тевяшова (Черткова)
_FA1: 1771, вступил на службу в лейб-гвардии Преображенский полк
_MILT: 1777, [[секунд-майор]] лейб-гвардии Преображенского полка
_MILT: 1 јануар 1786, [[премьер-майор]]
_MILT: 19 јун 1787, [[подполковник]]
Професија : од 1 јануар 1798, Воронежский губернский предводитель дворянства
Професија : 31 децембар 1804, [[статский советник]]
Професија : 26 јун 1818, [[действительный статский советник]]
Смрт: 11 април 1831, Москва, Российская империя, 23.04.1831 по н.с.
Свадба: ♀ Евдокия (Авдотья) Степановна Тевяшова (Черткова)
_FA1: 1771, вступил на службу в лейб-гвардии Преображенский полк
_MILT: 1777, [[секунд-майор]] лейб-гвардии Преображенского полка
_MILT: 1 јануар 1786, [[премьер-майор]]
_MILT: 19 јун 1787, [[подполковник]]
Професија : од 1 јануар 1798, Воронежский губернский предводитель дворянства
Професија : 31 децембар 1804, [[статский советник]]
Професија : 26 јун 1818, [[действительный статский советник]]
Смрт: 11 април 1831, Москва, Российская империя, 23.04.1831 по н.с.
15